Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Postponed - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |