House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |