House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | To Tax Policy: Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |