Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2025 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |