Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2025 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Do Pass Insurance; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Assigned to Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |