Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-017-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|