House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | To Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |