Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|