House | 04/10/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |