Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Public Health Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregg Johnson |