Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|