House | 04/10/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | To Fiscal Impact Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety and Infrastructure Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |