House
|
03/21/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
To Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|