House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | To Insurance Main Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |