House
|
04/15/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
To Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|