Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Briel
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martha Deuter
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|