House
|
04/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Briel
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
To Tax Policy: Other Taxes Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|