House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | To Fire Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |