Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Postponed - Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason R. Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|