House | 05/13/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Friess | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Friess | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Friess | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2025 | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |