House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | To Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |