House | 04/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |