Senate | 04/29/2025 | Assigned to Environment and Conservation | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Balkema | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 013-000-000 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Reported Back To Energy & Environment Committee; | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Energy & Environment Committee; 003-000-000 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |