Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Briel
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rick Ryan
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|