House
|
03/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|