House | 03/21/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Re-assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |