Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|