House
|
03/21/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|