House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|