Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 029-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|