House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | To Tax Policy: Finance Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |