House
|
04/11/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|