House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges; 019-000-000 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |