House
|
05/16/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2025
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|