House | 05/14/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |