House | 05/15/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 05/15/2025 | Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice & Public Safety Committee; 007-004-000 | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Crawford | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Assigned to Restorative Justice & Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |