Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|