Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Assigned to Criminal Law | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |