House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|