Illinois 2025-2026 Regular Session

Illinois Senate Bill SB0214 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/22/2025

                            104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB0214 Introduced 1/22/2025, by Sen. Andrew S. Chesney SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 35 ILCS 5/234 Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Removes a provision providing that the aggregate amount of credits awarded under a provision granting a credit to volunteer emergency workers may not exceed $5,000,000 in any calendar year. Effective immediately. LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b   A BILL FOR 104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB0214 Introduced 1/22/2025, by Sen. Andrew S. Chesney SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  35 ILCS 5/234 35 ILCS 5/234  Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Removes a provision providing that the aggregate amount of credits awarded under a provision granting a credit to volunteer emergency workers may not exceed $5,000,000 in any calendar year. Effective immediately.  LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b     LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b   A BILL FOR
104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB0214 Introduced 1/22/2025, by Sen. Andrew S. Chesney SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
35 ILCS 5/234 35 ILCS 5/234
35 ILCS 5/234
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Removes a provision providing that the aggregate amount of credits awarded under a provision granting a credit to volunteer emergency workers may not exceed $5,000,000 in any calendar year. Effective immediately.
LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b     LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
    LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
A BILL FOR
SB0214LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b   SB0214  LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
  SB0214  LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
1  AN ACT concerning revenue.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Income Tax Act is amended by
5  changing Section 234 as follows:
6  (35 ILCS 5/234)
7  Sec. 234. Volunteer emergency workers.
8  (a) For taxable years beginning on or after January 1,
9  2023 and beginning prior to January 1, 2028, each individual
10  who (i) serves as a volunteer emergency worker for at least 9
11  months during the taxable year and (ii) does not receive
12  compensation for his or her services as a volunteer emergency
13  worker of more than $5,000 for the taxable year may apply to
14  the Department for a credit against the taxes imposed by
15  subsections (a) and (b) of Section 201. The amount of the
16  credit shall be $500 per eligible individual. If a taxpayer
17  described in this subsection (a) is a volunteer member of a
18  county or municipal emergency services and disaster agency
19  under the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act, then the
20  taxpayer must serve as a volunteer emergency worker with the
21  county or municipal emergency services and disaster agency for
22  at least 100 hours during the taxable year. The aggregate
23  amount of all tax credits awarded by the Department under this

 

104TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY
 State of Illinois
 2025 and 2026 SB0214 Introduced 1/22/2025, by Sen. Andrew S. Chesney SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
35 ILCS 5/234 35 ILCS 5/234
35 ILCS 5/234
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Removes a provision providing that the aggregate amount of credits awarded under a provision granting a credit to volunteer emergency workers may not exceed $5,000,000 in any calendar year. Effective immediately.
LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b     LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
    LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

35 ILCS 5/234



    LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b

 

 



 

  SB0214  LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b


SB0214- 2 -LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b   SB0214 - 2 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
  SB0214 - 2 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
1  Section in any calendar year may not exceed $5,000,000.
2  Credits shall be awarded on a first-come first-served basis.
3  (b) A credit under this Section may not reduce a
4  taxpayer's liability to less than zero.
5  (c) By January 24 of each year, the Office of the State
6  Fire Marshal shall provide the Department of Revenue an
7  electronic file with the names of volunteer emergency workers,
8  other than volunteer emergency workers who are volunteer
9  members of a county or municipal emergency services and
10  disaster agency under the Illinois Emergency Management Agency
11  Act, who (i) volunteered for at least 9 months during the
12  immediately preceding calendar year, (ii) did not receive
13  compensation for their services as a volunteer emergency
14  worker of more than $5,000 during the immediately preceding
15  calendar year, and (iii) are registered with the Office of the
16  State Fire Marshal as of January 12 of the current year as
17  meeting the requirements of items (i) and (ii) for the
18  immediately preceding calendar year. The chief of the fire
19  department, fire protection district, or fire protection
20  association shall be responsible for notifying the State Fire
21  Marshal of the volunteer emergency workers who met the
22  requirements of items (i) and (ii) during the immediately
23  preceding calendar year by January 12 of the current year.
24  Notification shall be required in the format required by the
25  State Fire Marshal. The chief of the fire department, fire
26  protection district, or fire protection association shall be

 

 

  SB0214 - 2 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b


SB0214- 3 -LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b   SB0214 - 3 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
  SB0214 - 3 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
1  responsible for the verification and accuracy of their
2  submission to the State Fire Marshal under this subsection.
3  By January 24, 2025, and by January 24 of each year
4  thereafter, the Illinois Emergency Management Agency and
5  Office of Homeland Security shall provide the Department of
6  Revenue an electronic file with the names of volunteer
7  emergency workers who (A) volunteered with a county or
8  municipal emergency services and disaster agency pursuant to
9  the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act for at least 9
10  months during the immediately preceding calendar year, (B) did
11  not receive compensation for their services as a volunteer
12  emergency worker of more than $5,000 during the immediately
13  preceding calendar year, (C) volunteered with a county or
14  municipal emergency services and disaster agency pursuant to
15  the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act for at least 100
16  hours during the immediately preceding calendar year, and (D)
17  are registered with the Illinois Emergency Management Agency
18  and Office of Homeland Security as of January 12 of the current
19  year as meeting the requirements of items (A), (B), and (C) for
20  the immediately preceding calendar year. The coordinator of
21  the emergency services and disaster agency shall be
22  responsible for notifying the Illinois Emergency Management
23  Agency and Office of Homeland Security of the volunteer
24  emergency workers who met the requirements of items (A), (B),
25  and (C) during the immediately preceding calendar year by
26  January 12 of the current year. Notification shall be in the

 

 

  SB0214 - 3 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b


SB0214- 4 -LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b   SB0214 - 4 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
  SB0214 - 4 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b
1  format required by the Illinois Emergency Management Agency
2  and Office of Homeland Security. The coordinator of the
3  emergency services and disaster agency shall be responsible
4  for the verification and accuracy of their submission to the
5  Illinois Emergency Management Agency and Office of Homeland
6  Security under this subsection.
7  (d) As used in this Section, "volunteer emergency worker"
8  means a person who serves as a member, other than on a
9  full-time career basis, of a fire department, fire protection
10  district, or fire protection association that has a Fire
11  Department Identification Number issued by the Office of the
12  State Fire Marshal and who does not serve as a member on a
13  full-time career basis for another fire department, fire
14  protection district, fire protection association, or
15  governmental entity. For taxable years beginning on or after
16  January 1, 2024, "volunteer emergency worker" also means a
17  person who is a volunteer member of a county or municipal
18  emergency services and disaster agency pursuant to the
19  Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act.
20  (e) The Department shall adopt rules to implement and
21  administer this Section, including rules concerning
22  applications for the tax credit.
23  (Source: P.A. 103-9, eff. 6-7-23; 103-592, eff. 6-7-24.)

 

 

  SB0214 - 4 - LRB104 03807 HLH 13831 b