Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|