Senate | 05/09/2025 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 23, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |