Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Postponed - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |