House
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|