Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | To Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |