Senate | 04/08/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Li Arellano, Jr. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |