Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 9, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Do Pass State Government; 010-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to State Government | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Directed to Multiple Committees Refer to State Government, then Appropriations Committee. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |