Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 9, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Guzman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 008-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 007-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|