House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 049-005-000 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |