House
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|